PA HB716 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-4)
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-26 - Re-reported as committed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.177, No.175), known as The Administrative Code of 1929, in powers and duties of the Department of Labor and Industry, its departmental administrative and advisory boards and departmental administrative officers, providing for joint task force on misclassification of employees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In powers and duties of the Department of Labor and Industry, its departmental administrative and advisory boards and departmental administrative officers, providing for joint task force on misclassification of employees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - Senate - Senate Labor And Industry: Reported as Committed (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - House - House Floor: HB 716 PN 2007, FP (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - House - House Labor And Industry: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - House - House Labor And Industry: Adopt Amendment A01534 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-26SenateRe-reported as committed
2019-06-26SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-06-26SenateSecond consideration
2019-06-24SenateFirst consideration
2019-06-24SenateReported as committed
2019-06-20SenateReferred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY
2019-06-17SenateIn the Senate
2019-06-17HouseThird consideration and final passage (198-0)
2019-06-17HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-06-12HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-06-12HouseSecond consideration
2019-06-12HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-06-04HouseRe-committed to RULES
2019-06-04HouseFirst consideration
2019-06-04HouseReported as amended
2019-04-05HouseReferred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=716
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0716&pn=1242
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0716&pn=2007
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=26&theDate=06/04/2019&RollCallId=603
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=26&theDate=06/04/2019&RollCallId=604
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=06/12/2019&RollCallId=726
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=467
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/17/2019&RollCallId=785
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=13&theDate=06/24/2019&RollCallId=399
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=06/26/2019&RollCallId=468

Bill Comments

feedback