PA HB713 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 20-5)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-26 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-26 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of July 9, 1976 (P.L.817, No.143), known as the Mental Health Procedures Act, in involuntary examination and treatment, further providing for persons who may be subject to involuntary emergency examination and treatment, for involuntary emergency examination and treatment authorized by a physician - not to exceed one hundred twenty hours, for extended involuntary emergency treatment certified by a judge or mental health review officer - not to exceed twenty days, for court-ordered involuntary treatment not to exceed ninety days; and, in determinations affecting those charged with crime, or under sentence, further providing for incompetence to proceed on criminal charges and lack of criminal responsibility as defense.
Title
In involuntary examination and treatment, further providing for persons who may be subject to involuntary emergency examination and treatment, for involuntary emergency examination and treatment authorized by a physician - not to exceed one hundred twenty hours, for extended involuntary emergency treatment certified by a judge or mental health review officer - not to exceed twenty days, for court-ordered involuntary treatment not to exceed ninety days; and, in determinations affecting those charged with crime, or under sentence, further providing for incompetence to proceed on criminal charges and lack of criminal responsibility as defense.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-19 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-26 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-04-26 | House | Second consideration |
2017-04-25 | House | Removed from table |
2017-04-19 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-04-19 | House | First consideration |
2017-04-19 | House | Reported as committed |
2017-03-06 | House | Referred to HEALTH |