PA HB711 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-06-19 - Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS AND HOUSING
Pending: Senate Urban Affairs & Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-06-19 - Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS AND HOUSING
Pending: Senate Urban Affairs & Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of May 16, 1923 (P.L.207, No.153), referred to as the Municipal Claim and Tax Lien Law, further providing for municipal claims first lien, cities of first class, docketing, judgment and execution, for cities of the first class, recovery of judgment and sale free from claims, for redemption and for rule to show cause, decree, service and notice and providing for disposition of property in cities of the second class.
Title
Further providing for municipal claims first lien, cities of first class, docketing, judgment and execution, for cities of the first class, recovery of judgment and sale free from claims, for redemption and for rule to show cause, decree, service and notice and providing for disposition of property in cities of the second class.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-12 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-12 - House - House Floor: HB 711 PN 657, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 110 N: 93 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - House - House Housing And Community Development: Bring Up The Bill For Consideration (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-12 - House - House Floor: HB 711 PN 657, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 110 N: 93 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - House - House Housing And Community Development: Bring Up The Bill For Consideration (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-19 | Senate | Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS AND HOUSING |
2023-06-12 | Senate | In the Senate |
2023-06-12 | House | Third consideration and final passage (110-93) |
2023-06-12 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2023-06-07 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2023-06-07 | House | Second consideration |
2023-06-06 | House | Removed from table |
2023-05-24 | House | Laid on the table |
2023-05-24 | House | First consideration |
2023-05-24 | House | Reported as committed |
2023-03-27 | House | Referred to HOUSING AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |