PA HB706 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-1)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-13 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of June 3, 1937 (P.L.1333, No.320), known as the Pennsylvania Election Code, in election districts and polling places, providing for residence of incarcerated individuals and individuals attending a college or university living in congregate student housing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In election districts and polling places, providing for residence of incarcerated individuals and individuals attending a college or university living in congregate student housing.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-27 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-27 - House - House State Government: To Table (Y: 10 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-09-27 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A02335 (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-13HouseLaid on the table
2021-12-13HouseRemoved from table
2021-09-27HouseLaid on the table
2021-09-27HouseFirst consideration
2021-09-27HouseReported as amended, (with a negative recommendation) Sept. 27, 2021
2021-03-01HouseReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2021&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=706
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0706&pn=0676
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0706&pn=2177
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=36&theDate=09/27/2021&RollCallId=844
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=36&theDate=09/27/2021&RollCallId=845
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=36&theDate=09/27/2021&RollCallId=846

Bill Comments

feedback