PA HB703 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-3)
Status: Passed on October 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-29 - Act No. 84
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-3)
Status: Passed on October 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-29 - Act No. 84
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in school directors, providing for publication of e-mail addresses for school directors; and, in charter schools, providing for publication of e-mail addresses for board of trustees and further providing for applicability of other provisions of this act and of other acts and regulations.
Title
In school directors, providing for publication of e-mail addresses for school directors; and, in charter schools, providing for publication of e-mail addresses for board of trustees and further providing for applicability of other provisions of this act and of other acts and regulations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-10-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 703 PN 3670, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-22 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-18 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-18 - House - House Floor: HB 703 PN 3670, FP (Y: 200 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-04-29 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-29 - House - House Education: Adopt Amendment A04792 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-22 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-18 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-18 - House - House Floor: HB 703 PN 3670, FP (Y: 200 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-04-29 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-29 - House - House Education: Adopt Amendment A04792 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-29 | Senate | Act No. 84 |
2020-10-29 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2020-10-22 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2020-10-21 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2020-10-21 | Senate | Signed in House |
2020-10-21 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2020-10-19 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2020-10-05 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-10-05 | Senate | Second consideration |
2020-09-22 | Senate | First consideration |
2020-09-22 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2020-05-25 | Senate | Referred to EDUCATION |
2020-05-18 | Senate | In the Senate |
2020-05-18 | House | Third consideration and final passage (200-2) |
2020-05-18 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-05-05 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-05-05 | House | Second consideration |
2020-05-04 | House | Removed from table |
2020-04-29 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-04-29 | House | First consideration |
2020-04-29 | House | Reported as amended |
2019-03-05 | House | Referred to EDUCATION |