PA HB699 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 43-14)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-02-09 - Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of June 13, 1967 (P.L.31, No.21), known as the Human Services Code, in public assistance, further providing for reimbursement for certain medical assistance items and services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In public assistance, further providing for reimbursement for certain medical assistance items and services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-05 - House - House Floor: HB 699 PN 1948, FP (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - House - House Floor: HB 699 PN 750, 2017 A1428, PICKETT (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-09SenateReferred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
2018-02-05SenateIn the Senate
2018-02-05HouseThird consideration and final passage (194-0)
2018-01-23HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-06-07HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-06-07HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2017-06-05HouseRemoved from table
2017-05-23HouseLaid on the table
2017-05-23HouseFirst consideration
2017-05-23HouseReported as committed
2017-03-03HouseReferred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=699
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0699&pn=0750
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0699&pn=1948
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=42&theDate=05/23/2017&RollCallId=429
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=442
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=01/23/2018&RollCallId=1223
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=993

Bill Comments

feedback