PA HB698 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-5)
Status: Passed on December 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-12-10 - Act No. 76
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-5)
Status: Passed on December 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-12-10 - Act No. 76
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 34 (Game) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in hunting and furtaking, further providing for unlawful devices and methods; and, in special licenses and permits, further providing for permits for individuals with disabilities.
Title
In hunting and furtaking, further providing for unlawful devices and methods; and, in special licenses and permits, further providing for permits for individuals with disabilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-11-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 698 PN 2458, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-17 - Senate - Senate Game And Fisheries: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-17 - Senate - Senate Game And Fisheries: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-28 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-28 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-28 - House - House Floor: HB 698 PN 2458, FP (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-10-27 - House - House Floor: HB 698 PN 812, 2015 A3788, HANNA (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-10-20 - House - House Game And Fisheries: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-20 - House - House Game And Fisheries: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-17 - Senate - Senate Game And Fisheries: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-17 - Senate - Senate Game And Fisheries: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-28 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-28 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-28 - House - House Floor: HB 698 PN 2458, FP (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-10-27 - House - House Floor: HB 698 PN 812, 2015 A3788, HANNA (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-10-20 - House - House Game And Fisheries: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-20 - House - House Game And Fisheries: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-10 | Senate | Act No. 76 |
2015-12-10 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2015-12-04 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2015-12-04 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2015-12-01 | Senate | Signed in House |
2015-11-24 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2015-11-18 | Senate | Second consideration |
2015-11-17 | Senate | First consideration |
2015-11-17 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2015-10-30 | Senate | Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES |
2015-10-28 | Senate | In the Senate |
2015-10-28 | House | Third consideration and final passage (196-0) |
2015-10-28 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-10-27 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-10-27 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2015-10-26 | House | Removed from table |
2015-10-20 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-10-20 | House | First consideration |
2015-10-20 | House | Reported as committed |
2015-03-03 | House | Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES |