PA HB694 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-8)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-22 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-22 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act designating the Harley-Davidson motorcycle as the official State motorcycle of Pennsylvania.
Title
Designating the Harley-Davidson motorcycle as the official State motorcycle of Pennsylvania.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-10-29 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-22 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-01-22 | House | Removed from table |
2019-10-30 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-10-30 | House | First consideration |
2019-10-30 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-03-05 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |