PA HB689 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-5)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-18 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-18 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, further providing for referendum or public hearing required prior to construction or lease.
Title
Further providing for referendum or public hearing required prior to construction or lease.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-15 - House - HB 689 PN 1706, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 106 N: 85 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-18 | Referred to EDUCATION | |
2010-03-15 | In the Senate | |
2010-03-15 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2010-03-10 | Second consideration | |
2010-03-10 | Re-reported as committed | |
2009-04-30 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2009-04-30 | Removed from table | |
2009-04-29 | Laid on the table | |
2009-04-29 | First consideration | |
2009-04-29 | Reported as amended | |
2009-03-03 | Referred to EDUCATION |