PA HB686 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-4)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-06 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, further providing for duties of public institutions of higher education and for the Transfer and Articulation Oversight Committee; providing for participation by State-related institutions and for retroactivity; and making a related repeal.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Further providing for duties of public institutions of higher education and for the Transfer and Articulation Oversight Committee; providing for participation by State-related institutions and for retroactivity; and making a related repeal.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-06-06HouseLaid on the table
2011-06-06HouseRemoved from table
2011-04-06HouseLaid on the table
2011-04-06HouseFirst consideration
2011-04-06HouseReported as committed
2011-02-15HouseReferred to EDUCATION

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback