PA HB684 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of August 26, 1971 (P.L.351, No.91), known as the State Lottery Law, in pharmaceutical assistance for the elderly, further providing for the definition of "income."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In pharmaceutical assistance for the elderly, further providing for the definition of "income."

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Aging And Youth: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - House Floor: HB 684 PN 697, FP (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-04SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-06-04SenateSecond consideration
2019-06-03SenateFirst consideration
2019-06-03SenateReported as committed
2019-04-22SenateReferred to AGING AND YOUTH
2019-04-10SenateIn the Senate
2019-04-10HouseThird consideration and final passage (193-0)
2019-04-10HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-04-09HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-04-09HouseSecond consideration
2019-04-08HouseRemoved from table
2019-03-27HouseLaid on the table
2019-03-27HouseFirst consideration
2019-03-27HouseReported as committed
2019-03-01HouseReferred to AGING AND OLDER ADULT SERVICES

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=684
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0684&pn=0697
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=32&theDate=03/27/2019&RollCallId=210
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=173
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=04/10/2019&RollCallId=261
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=1&theDate=06/03/2019&RollCallId=184

Bill Comments

feedback