PA HB682 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-12-09 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-12-09 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 13, 2008 (P.L.182, No.27), known as the Clean Indoor Air Act, further providing for definitions; further prohibiting smoking in public places, for signage, for enforcement, for penalties and for administration; repealing provisions relating to preemption; providing for local ordinances; and making a related repeal of the Fire and Panic Act.
Title
Further providing for definitions; further prohibiting smoking in public places, for signage, for enforcement, for penalties and for administration; repealing provisions relating to preemption; providing for local ordinances; and making a related repeal of the Fire and Panic Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-11-17 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A04155 (Y: 9 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-17 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A04154 (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-17 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 10 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-17 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A04154 (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-17 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A04155 (Y: 9 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-17 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 10 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-17 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A04154 (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-17 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 10 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-17 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A04154 (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-17 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A04155 (Y: 9 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-17 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 10 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-09 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-12-09 | House | Removed from table |
2015-11-17 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-11-17 | House | First consideration |
2015-11-17 | House | Reported as amended |
2015-03-04 | House | Referred to HEALTH |