PA HB681 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-6)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-06-14 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act prohibiting enforcement of covenants not to compete in health care practitioner employment agreements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibiting enforcement of covenants not to compete in health care practitioner employment agreements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-26 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A00663 (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-06-14HouseRemoved from table
2022-06-14HouseLaid on the table
2022-03-28HouseRemoved from table
2022-03-28HouseLaid on the table
2021-11-16HouseRemoved from table
2021-11-16HouseLaid on the table
2021-09-21HouseRemoved from table
2021-09-21HouseLaid on the table
2021-05-26HouseRe-reported as committed
2021-04-21HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-04-21HouseSecond consideration
2021-04-20HouseRemoved from table
2021-04-07HouseLaid on the table
2021-04-07HouseFirst consideration
2021-04-07HouseReported as amended
2021-02-26HouseReferred to HEALTH

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2021&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=681
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0681&pn=0640
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0681&pn=1187
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/FN/2021/0/HB0681P1187.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=55&theDate=04/07/2021&RollCallId=278
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=55&theDate=04/07/2021&RollCallId=279
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=05/26/2021&RollCallId=507

Bill Comments

feedback