PA HB681 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on June 23 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-27 - Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES
Pending: Senate Game & Fisheries Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 30 (Fish) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, repealing provisions relating to powers of waterways patrolmen.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Repealing provisions relating to powers of waterways patrolmen.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-06-27SenateReferred to GAME AND FISHERIES
2014-06-23SenateIn the Senate
2014-06-23HouseThird consideration and final passage (200-0)
2014-06-23HouseRe-reported as committed
2014-06-18HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2014-06-18HouseSecond consideration
2014-06-17HouseRemoved from table
2013-12-09HouseLaid on the table
2013-12-09HouseRemoved from table
2013-10-01HouseLaid on the table
2013-10-01HouseFirst consideration
2013-10-01HouseReported as committed
2013-02-12HouseReferred to GAME AND FISHERIES

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback