PA HB675 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-06 - Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES
Pending: Senate Game & Fisheries Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-06 - Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES
Pending: Senate Game & Fisheries Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 30 (Fish) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in fishing licenses, further providing for exemptions from license requirements.
Title
In fishing licenses, further providing for exemptions from license requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-05 - House - House Floor: HB 675 PN 721, FP (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House Game And Fisheries: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House Game And Fisheries: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-06 | Senate | Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES |
2017-04-05 | Senate | In the Senate |
2017-04-05 | House | Third consideration and final passage (191-0) |
2017-04-05 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-04-04 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-04-04 | House | Second consideration |
2017-04-03 | House | Removed from table |
2017-03-21 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-03-21 | House | First consideration |
2017-03-21 | House | Reported as committed |
2017-03-02 | House | Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES |