PA HB668 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-4)
Status: Passed on November 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-03 - Act No. 105 of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-4)
Status: Passed on November 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-03 - Act No. 105 of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of May 31, 1945 (P.L.1198, No.418), known as the Surface Mining Conservation and Reclamation Act, further providing for Mining and Reclamation Advisory Board.
Title
Further providing for Mining and Reclamation Advisory Board.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-10-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-10-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 668 PN 629, Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate Environmental Resources And Energy: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-09 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-09 - House - House Floor: HB 668 PN 629, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-10-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 668 PN 629, Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate Environmental Resources And Energy: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-09 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-09 - House - House Floor: HB 668 PN 629, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-03 | Senate | Act No. 105 of 2022 |
2022-11-03 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2022-10-27 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2022-10-26 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2022-10-26 | Senate | Signed in House |
2022-10-26 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2022-10-26 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Second consideration |
2022-01-25 | Senate | First consideration |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2021-11-10 | Senate | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |
2021-11-09 | Senate | In the Senate |
2021-11-09 | House | Third consideration and final passage (200-0) |
2021-11-09 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-11-08 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-11-08 | House | Second consideration |
2021-10-27 | House | Removed from table |
2021-09-15 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-09-15 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-06-08 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2021-06-08 | House | First consideration |
2021-06-08 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-02-26 | House | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |