PA HB661 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-2)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-03-30 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of December 12, 1986 (P.L.1559, No.169), known as the Whistleblower Law, further providing for definitions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Further providing for definitions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-12-13 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-03-30HouseLaid on the table
2022-03-30HouseRemoved from table
2021-12-13HouseLaid on the table
2021-12-13HouseFirst consideration
2021-12-13HouseReported as committed
2021-02-26HouseReferred to JUDICIARY

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback