PA HB661 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 26-12)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2007 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2007-10-15 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Status: Introduced on March 9 2007 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2007-10-15 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Summary
An Act amending the act of May 1, 1933 (P.L.103, No.69), known as The Second Class Township Code, further providing for intergovernmental cooperation, joint ownership and maintenance.
Title
An Act amending the act of May 1, 1933 (P.L.103, No.69), known as The Second Class Township Code, further providing for intergovernmental cooperation, joint ownership and maintenance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2007-10-15 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2007-10-15 | Removed from table | |
2007-09-17 | Laid on the table | |
2007-09-17 | Re-reported as committed | |
2007-06-28 | Re-committed to RULES | |
2007-06-28 | First consideration | |
2007-06-28 | Reported as committed | |
2007-03-09 | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=661 |