PA HB655 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-24 - Referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A Supplement to the act of May 29, 2020 (P.L. , No.1A), entitled "An act to provide appropriations from the General Fund for the expenses of the Executive, Legislative and Judicial Departments of the Commonwealth, the public debt and the public schools for the fiscal year July 1, 2020, to June 30, 2021, and for the payment of bills incurred and remaining unpaid at the close of the fiscal year ending June 30, 2020; to provide appropriations from special funds and accounts to the Executive and Judicial Departments for the fiscal year July 1, 2020, to June 30, 2021, and for the payment of bills remaining unpaid at the close of the fiscal year ending June 30, 2020; to provide for the appropriation of Federal funds to the Executive and Judicial Departments for the fiscal year July 1, 2020, to June 30, 2021, and for the payment of bills remaining unpaid at the close of the fiscal year ending June 30, 2020; and to provide for the additional appropriation of Federal and State funds to the Executive and Judicial Departments for the fiscal year July 1, 2019, to June 30, 2020, and for the payment of bills incurred and remaining unpaid at the close of the fiscal year ending June 30, 2019," adding a Federal appropriation to the Department of Education for the fiscal year July 1, 2020, to June 30, 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A Supplement to the act of May 29, 2020 (P.L. , No.1A), entitled "An act to provide appropriations from the General Fund for the expenses of the Executive, Legislative and Judicial Departments of the Commonwealth, the public debt and the public schools for the fiscal year July 1, 2020, to June 30, 2021, and for the payment of bills incurred and remaining unpaid at the close of the fiscal year ending June 30, 2020; to provide appropriations from special funds and accounts to the Executive and Judicial Departments for the fiscal year July 1, 2020, to June 30, 2021, and for the payment of bills remaining unpaid at the close of the fiscal year ending June 30, 2020; to provide for the appropriation of Federal funds to the Executive and Judicial Departments for the fiscal year July 1, 2020, to June 30, 2021, and for the payment of bills remaining unpaid at the close of the fiscal year ending June 30, 2020; and to provide for the additional appropriation of Federal and State funds to the Executive and Judicial Departments for the fiscal year July 1, 2019, to June 30, 2020, and for the payment of bills incurred and remaining unpaid at the close of the fiscal year ending June 30, 2019," adding a Federal appropriation to the Department of Education for the fiscal year July 1, 2020, to June 30, 2021.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-24HouseReferred to APPROPRIATIONS

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback