PA HB65 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-4)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-11 - Referred to COMMUNITY, ECONOMIC AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT
Pending: Senate Community, Economic & Recreational Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-11 - Referred to COMMUNITY, ECONOMIC AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT
Pending: Senate Community, Economic & Recreational Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending Title 4 (Amusements) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, providing for Internet gambling public awareness campaign and for revocation and auction of slot machine license; further providing for Category 2 slot machine license, for number of slot machine licenses and for table game taxes; and providing for prohibition on use of State funds.
Title
Providing for Internet gambling public awareness campaign and for revocation and auction of slot machine license; further providing for Category 2 slot machine license, for number of slot machine licenses and for table game taxes; and providing for prohibition on use of State funds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-02 - House - HB 65 PN 3424, FP (Y: 140 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-05-02 - House - HB 65 PN 3424, MOT RECON, DERMODY (Y: 177 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-05-02 - House - HB 65 PN 3424, FP (Y: 153 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2012-05-02 - House - HB 65 PN 3424, 2011 A10140, SCHRODER (Y: 182 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2012-04-30 - House - HB 65 PN 2552, 2011 A9882, MOT GERMANE, SCHRODER (Y: 83 N: 108 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2012-04-30 - House - HB 65 PN 2552, 2011 A9832, BROWN, V. (Y: 190 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-04-30 - House - HB 65 PN 2552, 2011 A8664, YOUNGBLOOD (Y: 79 N: 112 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2012-04-30 - House - HB 65 PN 2552, 2011 A8663, YOUNGBLOOD (Y: 79 N: 112 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2012-04-30 - House - HB 65 PN 2552, 2011 A9810, MOT GERMANE, TURZAI (Y: 85 N: 107 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2012-04-30 - House - HB 65 PN 2552, 2011 A9826, BROWNLEE (Y: 181 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-04-30 - House - HB 65 PN 2552, 2011 A9809, YOUNGBLOOD (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-04-30 - House - HB 65 PN 2552, 2011 A9808, YOUNGBLOOD (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-04-30 - House - HB 65 PN 2552, 2011 A9862, SCHRODER (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-05-02 - House - HB 65 PN 3424, MOT RECON, DERMODY (Y: 177 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-05-02 - House - HB 65 PN 3424, FP (Y: 153 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2012-05-02 - House - HB 65 PN 3424, 2011 A10140, SCHRODER (Y: 182 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2012-04-30 - House - HB 65 PN 2552, 2011 A9882, MOT GERMANE, SCHRODER (Y: 83 N: 108 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2012-04-30 - House - HB 65 PN 2552, 2011 A9832, BROWN, V. (Y: 190 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-04-30 - House - HB 65 PN 2552, 2011 A8664, YOUNGBLOOD (Y: 79 N: 112 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2012-04-30 - House - HB 65 PN 2552, 2011 A8663, YOUNGBLOOD (Y: 79 N: 112 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2012-04-30 - House - HB 65 PN 2552, 2011 A9810, MOT GERMANE, TURZAI (Y: 85 N: 107 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2012-04-30 - House - HB 65 PN 2552, 2011 A9826, BROWNLEE (Y: 181 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-04-30 - House - HB 65 PN 2552, 2011 A9809, YOUNGBLOOD (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-04-30 - House - HB 65 PN 2552, 2011 A9808, YOUNGBLOOD (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-04-30 - House - HB 65 PN 2552, 2011 A9862, SCHRODER (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-11 | Senate | Referred to COMMUNITY, ECONOMIC AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT |
2012-05-02 | Senate | In the Senate |
2012-05-02 | House | Final passage (140-48) |
2012-05-02 | House | Vote on final passage reconsidered (177-10) |
2012-05-02 | House | Final passage (153-29) |
2012-05-02 | House | Third consideration, with amendments |
2012-05-01 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2012-04-30 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2012-04-30 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2012-04-03 | House | Removed from table |
2011-12-05 | House | Laid on the table |
2011-12-05 | House | Removed from table |
2011-10-17 | House | Laid on the table |
2011-10-17 | House | First consideration |
2011-10-17 | House | Reported as amended |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to GAMING OVERSIGHT |