PA HB65 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-11)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2007 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2007-12-11 - Laid on the table
Status: Introduced on January 30 2007 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2007-12-11 - Laid on the table
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, providing for parental discretion in classroom placement of twins and higher order multiples.
Title
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, providing for parental discretion in classroom placement of twins and higher order multiples.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2007-12-11 | Laid on the table | |
2007-11-14 | Re-reported as committed | |
2007-04-23 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2007-04-23 | Removed from table | |
2007-04-18 | Laid on the table | |
2007-04-18 | First consideration | |
2007-04-18 | Reported as amended | |
2007-01-30 | Referred to EDUCATION |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=65 |