PA HB645 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-14)
Status: Passed on October 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-24 - Act No. 100
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of March 4, 1971 (P.L.6, No.2), known as the Tax Reform Code of 1971, in realty transfer tax, further providing for excluded transactions; and, in neighborhood assistance tax credit, further providing for tax credit and for grant of tax credit and providing for reporting.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In realty transfer tax, further providing for excluded transactions; and, in neighborhood assistance tax credit, further providing for tax credit and for grant of tax credit and providing for reporting.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-10-17 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 645 PN 4278, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-17 - House - House Floor: HB 645 PN 4278, CONCUR (Y: 175 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2018-10-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-03 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - House - House Floor: HB 645 PN 1695, FP (Y: 188 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House Floor: HB 645 PN 1695, 2017 A1209, SCHWEYER (Y: 76 N: 113 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2017-05-09 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 17 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - House Finance: Adopt Amendment A01170 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-24HouseAct No. 100
2018-10-24HouseApproved by the Governor
2018-10-18HousePresented to the Governor
2018-10-17HouseSigned in Senate
2018-10-17HouseSigned in House
2018-10-17HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments (175-5)
2018-10-17HouseRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2018-10-17HouseReferred to RULES
2018-10-17HouseIn the House
2018-10-17SenateThird consideration and final passage (49-0)
2018-10-16SenateAmended on third consideration
2018-10-16SenateRe-reported as committed
2018-10-15SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-10-15SenateSecond consideration
2018-10-03SenateFirst consideration
2018-10-03SenateReported as amended
2018-04-30SenateReferred to FINANCE
2018-04-16SenateIn the Senate
2018-04-16HouseThird consideration and final passage (188-7)
2018-04-16HouseRe-reported as committed
2018-04-11HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-04-11HouseSecond consideration
2018-04-10HouseRemoved from table
2017-06-22HouseLaid on the table
2017-06-22HouseRemoved from table
2017-05-09HouseLaid on the table
2017-05-09HouseFirst consideration
2017-05-09HouseReported as amended
2017-02-28HouseReferred to FINANCE

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=645
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0645&pn=0688
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0645&pn=1695
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0645&pn=4148
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0645&pn=4278
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=16&theDate=05/09/2017&RollCallId=349
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=16&theDate=05/09/2017&RollCallId=350
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1097
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1113
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=04/16/2018&RollCallId=1436
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=25&theDate=10/03/2018&RollCallId=1173
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=10/16/2018&RollCallId=1215
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1624
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=729
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=10/17/2018&RollCallId=2107

Bill Comments

feedback