PA HB645 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-13-1)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-06-22 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of March 4, 1971 (P.L.6, No.2), known as the Tax Reform Code of 1971, in neighborhood assistance tax credit, further providing for tax credit and for grant of tax credit and providing for reporting.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In neighborhood assistance tax credit, further providing for tax credit and for grant of tax credit and providing for reporting.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-09 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - House Finance: Adopt Amendment A01170 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-22HouseLaid on the table
2017-06-22HouseRemoved from table
2017-05-09HouseLaid on the table
2017-05-09HouseFirst consideration
2017-05-09HouseReported as amended
2017-02-28HouseReferred to FINANCE

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback