PA HB641 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-4)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 53 (Municipalities Generally) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in assessments of persons and property, providing for senior property tax freeze.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In assessments of persons and property, providing for senior property tax freeze.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-10 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - House Local Government: Adopt Amendment A01185 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-11HouseRemoved from table
2018-04-11HouseLaid on the table
2017-12-06HouseRemoved from table
2017-12-06HouseLaid on the table
2017-10-03HouseRemoved from table
2017-10-03HouseLaid on the table
2017-07-07HouseRemoved from table
2017-07-07HouseLaid on the table
2017-06-06HouseRemoved from table
2017-05-10HouseLaid on the table
2017-05-10HouseFirst consideration
2017-05-10HouseReported as amended
2017-02-27HouseReferred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback