PA HB636 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 23 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-25 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 23 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-25 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act designating the interchange located on I-279 at Camp Horne Road in Ohio Township, Allegheny County, as the Scott F. Hirsh Memorial Interchange.
Title
Designating the interchange located on I-279 at Camp Horne Road in Ohio Township, Allegheny County, as the Scott F. Hirsh Memorial Interchange.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-10-27 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - House - House Floor: HB 636 PN 593, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - House - House Floor: HB 636 PN 593, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-25 | Senate | Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9) |
2021-10-27 | Senate | First consideration |
2021-10-27 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2021-06-23 | Senate | In the Senate |
2021-06-23 | House | Third consideration and final passage (201-0) |
2021-06-16 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-06-15 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-06-15 | House | Second consideration |
2021-06-14 | House | Removed from table |
2021-06-08 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-06-08 | House | Removed from table |
2021-03-23 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-03-23 | House | First consideration |
2021-03-23 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-02-24 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |