PA HB631 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 19-2)
Status: Passed on February 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-21 - Act No. 10
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Titles 18 (Crimes and Offenses), 23 (Domestic Relations) and 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in sexual offenses, further providing for conduct relating to sex offenders and for general rule; in falsification and intimidation, further providing for the offense of failure to comply with registration requirements, defining the offense of failure to comply with 42 Pa.C.S. Ch. 97 Subch. I registration requirements and imposing penalties; in proceedings prior to petition to adopt, further providing for grounds for involuntary termination and for definitions; in domestic and sexual violence victim address confidentiality, further providing for agency use of designated address; in sentencing, providing for a mandatory period of probation for certain sexual offenders and extensively revising registration of sexual offenders provisions; and making editorial changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In sexual offenses, further providing for conduct relating to sex offenders and for general rule; in falsification and intimidation, further providing for the offense of failure to comply with registration requirements, defining the offense of failure to comply with 42 Pa.C.S. Ch. 97 Subch. I registration requirements and imposing penalties; in proceedings prior to petition to adopt, further providing for grounds for involuntary termination and for definitions; in domestic and sexual violence victim address confidentiality, further providing for agency use of designated address; in sentencing, providing for a mandatory period of probation for certain sexual offenders and extensively revising registration of sexual offenders provisions; and making editorial changes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-06 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 631 PN 2992, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House Floor: HB 631 PN 2992, CONCUR (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-07-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-30 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - House Floor: HB 631 PN 668, FP (Y: 189 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House Judiciary: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-21HouseAct No. 10
2018-02-21HouseApproved by the Governor
2018-02-21HousePresented to the Governor
2018-02-21HouseSigned in Senate
2018-02-06HouseSigned in House
2018-02-06HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments (194-0)
2018-02-06HouseRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2018-02-06HouseReferred to RULES
2018-02-06HouseIn the House
2018-02-06SenateThird consideration and final passage (49-0)
2018-02-05SenateAmended on third consideration
2018-01-31SenateRemoved from table
2017-09-20SenateLaid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
2017-07-08SenateRe-reported as committed
2017-07-08SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-07-08SenateSecond consideration
2017-06-30SenateFirst consideration
2017-06-30SenateReported as committed
2017-04-06SenateReferred to JUDICIARY
2017-04-03SenateIn the Senate
2017-04-03HouseThird consideration and final passage (189-9)
2017-04-03HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-03-22HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-03-22HouseSecond consideration
2017-03-21HouseRemoved from table
2017-03-21HouseLaid on the table
2017-03-21HouseFirst consideration
2017-03-21HouseReported as committed
2017-02-24HouseReferred to JUDICIARY

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=631
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0631&pn=0668
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0631&pn=2992
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=03/21/2017&RollCallId=109
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=120
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=04/03/2017&RollCallId=177
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=39&theDate=06/30/2017&RollCallId=381
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=07/08/2017&RollCallId=408
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1004
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=415
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=02/06/2018&RollCallId=1265

Bill Comments

feedback