PA HB630 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-16 - Re-reported as committed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-16 - Re-reported as committed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 51 (Military Affairs) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in military leave of absence, further providing for employment discrimination for military membership or duty.
Title
In military leave of absence, further providing for employment discrimination for military membership or duty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-11-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-20 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - House - House Floor: HB 630 PN 625, FP (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-20 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - House - House Floor: HB 630 PN 625, FP (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-16 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-11-20 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-11-20 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |
2019-06-03 | Senate | In the Senate |
2019-06-03 | House | Third consideration and final passage (192-0) |
2019-06-03 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-05-15 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-05-15 | House | Second consideration |
2019-05-14 | House | Removed from table |
2019-05-08 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-05-08 | House | First consideration |
2019-05-08 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-02-28 | House | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |