PA HB63 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to the administration and distribution of COVID-19 vaccinations in this Commonwealth.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the administration and distribution of COVID-19 vaccinations in this Commonwealth.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-24 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Floor: HB 63 PN 1025, FP (Y: 135 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Floor: HB 63 PN 937, 2021 A538, SCHROEDER (Y: 157 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Floor: HB 63 PN 937, 2021 A566, C. WILLIAMS (Y: 197 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Floor: HB 63 PN 937, 2021 A536, MIHALEK (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Floor: HB 63 PN 937, 2021 A535, LAWRENCE (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-13SenateReferred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
2021-03-24SenateIn the Senate
2021-03-24HouseThird consideration and final passage (135-66)
2021-03-24HouseRe-reported as committed
2021-03-23HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-03-23HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2021-03-22HouseRemoved from table
2021-03-17HouseLaid on the table
2021-03-17HouseFirst consideration
2021-03-17HouseReported as committed
2021-03-16HouseReferred to HEALTH

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2021&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=63
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0063&pn=0937
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0063&pn=1025
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/FN/2021/0/HB0063P1025.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=55&theDate=03/17/2021&RollCallId=160
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=89
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=90
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=91
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=92
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=103
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=03/24/2021&RollCallId=242

Bill Comments 750

feedback