PA HB63 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-04 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-04 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 23 (Domestic Relations) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in preliminary provisions relating to adoption, further providing for the definition of "intermediary."
Title
In preliminary provisions relating to adoption, further providing for the definition of "intermediary."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - House Floor: HB 63 PN 58, FP (Y: 187 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - House Children And Youth: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - House Floor: HB 63 PN 58, FP (Y: 187 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - House Children And Youth: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-04 | Senate | Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9) |
2018-03-27 | Senate | First consideration |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2017-03-13 | Senate | In the Senate |
2017-03-13 | House | Third consideration and final passage (187-0) |
2017-03-13 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-02-08 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-02-08 | House | Second consideration |
2017-02-07 | House | Removed from table |
2017-02-06 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-02-06 | House | First consideration |
2017-02-06 | House | Reported as committed |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to CHILDREN AND YOUTH |