PA HB618 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 35-11)
Status: Engrossed on September 25 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-10-08 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 25 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-10-08 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in charter schools, further providing for funding for charter schools.
Title
In charter schools, further providing for funding for charter schools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-29 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-25 - House - HB 618 PN 2371, FP (Y: 133 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-09-25 - House - HB 618 PN 2371, MOT PROCEED WITH BILL, TURZAI (Y: 173 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-09-24 - House - HB 618 PN 1917, AGREE TO ON, SECOND CONSIDERATION (Y: 99 N: 94 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-09-24 - House - HB 618 PN 1917, 2013 A1860, TRUITT (Y: 19 N: 178 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2013-09-24 - House - HB 618 PN 1917, 2013 A1860, MOT RECON, BROOKS (Y: 153 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-09-24 - House - HB 618 PN 1917, 2013 A1882, STURLA (Y: 94 N: 102 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2013-09-24 - House - HB 618 PN 1917, 2013 A1838, CARROLL (Y: 97 N: 99 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2013-09-24 - House - HB 618 PN 1917, 2013 A1837, SANTARSIERO (Y: 92 N: 105 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2013-09-24 - House - HB 618 PN 1917, 2013 A2029, TAYLOR (Y: 128 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-09-24 - House - HB 618 PN 1917, 2013 A1939, MAHER (Y: 111 N: 85 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-09-24 - House - HB 618 PN 1917, 2013 A2935, AUMENT (Y: 193 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-09-24 - House - HB 618 PN 1917, 2013 A1832, LONGIETTI (Y: 185 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-09-24 - House - HB 618 PN 1917, 2013 A2596, LONGIETTI (Y: 84 N: 111 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2013-09-24 - House - HB 618 PN 1917, 2013 A2076, LONGIETTI (Y: 88 N: 107 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2013-09-24 - House - HB 618 PN 1917, 2013 A2597, LONGIETTI (Y: 88 N: 107 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2013-09-24 - House - HB 618 PN 1917, 2013 A1830, HARKINS (Y: 88 N: 107 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2013-09-24 - House - HB 618 PN 1917, 2013 A1938, MAHER (Y: 60 N: 135 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2013-09-24 - House - HB 618 PN 1917, 2013 A1836, ROEBUCK (Y: 92 N: 103 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2013-09-24 - House - HB 618 PN 1917, 2013 A2440, CONKLIN (Y: 80 N: 115 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2013-09-24 - House - HB 618 PN 1917, 2013 A1839, ROEBUCK (Y: 93 N: 102 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2013-09-24 - House - HB 618 PN 1917, 2013 A2061, MOLCHANY (Y: 93 N: 101 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2013-09-24 - House - HB 618 PN 1917, 2013 A1864, TRUITT (Y: 93 N: 102 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2013-09-24 - House - HB 618 PN 1917, 2013 A1861, TRUITT (Y: 12 N: 183 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2013-09-24 - House - HB 618 PN 1917, 2013 A1860, TRUITT (Y: 22 N: 174 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2013-09-24 - House - HB 618 PN 1917, 2013 A1859, TRUITT (Y: 20 N: 176 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2013-09-25 - House - HB 618 PN 2371, FP (Y: 133 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-09-25 - House - HB 618 PN 2371, MOT PROCEED WITH BILL, TURZAI (Y: 173 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-09-24 - House - HB 618 PN 1917, AGREE TO ON, SECOND CONSIDERATION (Y: 99 N: 94 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-09-24 - House - HB 618 PN 1917, 2013 A1860, TRUITT (Y: 19 N: 178 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2013-09-24 - House - HB 618 PN 1917, 2013 A1860, MOT RECON, BROOKS (Y: 153 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-09-24 - House - HB 618 PN 1917, 2013 A1882, STURLA (Y: 94 N: 102 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2013-09-24 - House - HB 618 PN 1917, 2013 A1838, CARROLL (Y: 97 N: 99 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2013-09-24 - House - HB 618 PN 1917, 2013 A1837, SANTARSIERO (Y: 92 N: 105 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2013-09-24 - House - HB 618 PN 1917, 2013 A2029, TAYLOR (Y: 128 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-09-24 - House - HB 618 PN 1917, 2013 A1939, MAHER (Y: 111 N: 85 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-09-24 - House - HB 618 PN 1917, 2013 A2935, AUMENT (Y: 193 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-09-24 - House - HB 618 PN 1917, 2013 A1832, LONGIETTI (Y: 185 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-09-24 - House - HB 618 PN 1917, 2013 A2596, LONGIETTI (Y: 84 N: 111 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2013-09-24 - House - HB 618 PN 1917, 2013 A2076, LONGIETTI (Y: 88 N: 107 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2013-09-24 - House - HB 618 PN 1917, 2013 A2597, LONGIETTI (Y: 88 N: 107 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2013-09-24 - House - HB 618 PN 1917, 2013 A1830, HARKINS (Y: 88 N: 107 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2013-09-24 - House - HB 618 PN 1917, 2013 A1938, MAHER (Y: 60 N: 135 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2013-09-24 - House - HB 618 PN 1917, 2013 A1836, ROEBUCK (Y: 92 N: 103 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2013-09-24 - House - HB 618 PN 1917, 2013 A2440, CONKLIN (Y: 80 N: 115 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2013-09-24 - House - HB 618 PN 1917, 2013 A1839, ROEBUCK (Y: 93 N: 102 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2013-09-24 - House - HB 618 PN 1917, 2013 A2061, MOLCHANY (Y: 93 N: 101 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2013-09-24 - House - HB 618 PN 1917, 2013 A1864, TRUITT (Y: 93 N: 102 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2013-09-24 - House - HB 618 PN 1917, 2013 A1861, TRUITT (Y: 12 N: 183 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2013-09-24 - House - HB 618 PN 1917, 2013 A1860, TRUITT (Y: 22 N: 174 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2013-09-24 - House - HB 618 PN 1917, 2013 A1859, TRUITT (Y: 20 N: 176 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-08 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-09-22 | Senate | Removed from table |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2014-06-29 | Senate | First consideration |
2014-06-29 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2013-10-15 | Senate | Referred to EDUCATION |
2013-09-25 | Senate | In the Senate |
2013-09-25 | House | Third consideration and final passage (133-62) |
2013-09-25 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2013-09-24 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-09-24 | House | Second consideration, with amendments (99-94) |
2013-06-30 | House | Removed from table |
2013-06-30 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-06-04 | House | Removed from table |
2013-06-03 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-06-03 | House | First consideration |
2013-06-03 | House | Reported as amended |
2013-03-13 | House | Corrective Reprint, Printer's No. 1159 |
2013-02-08 | House | Referred to EDUCATION |