PA HB616 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-8)
Status: Engrossed on December 16 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-12-26 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of April 14, 1972 (P.L.233, No.64), known as The Controlled Substance, Drug, Device and Cosmetic Act, further providing for schedules of controlled substances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Further providing for schedules of controlled substances.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-12-16 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - House - House Floor: HB 616 PN 2760, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-10-22 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A02658 (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-22 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-26SenateReferred to JUDICIARY
2019-12-16SenateIn the Senate
2019-12-16HouseThird consideration and final passage (195-0)
2019-12-16HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-11-21HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-11-21HouseSecond consideration
2019-11-20HouseRemoved from table
2019-10-22HouseLaid on the table
2019-10-22HouseFirst consideration
2019-10-22HouseReported as amended
2019-02-28HouseReferred to JUDICIARY

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=616
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0616&pn=0611
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0616&pn=2760
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=10/22/2019&RollCallId=1225
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=10/22/2019&RollCallId=1224
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=959
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=12/16/2019&RollCallId=1520

Bill Comments

feedback