PA HB615 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-6)
Status: Passed on July 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Act No. 52
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-6)
Status: Passed on July 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Act No. 52
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 71 (State Government) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in retirement for State employees and officers, further defining "enforcement officer"; and providing for installment payments.
Title
In retirement for State employees and officers, further defining "enforcement officer"; and providing for installment payments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 615 PN 1784, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - House - House Floor: HB 615 PN 1784, FP (Y: 196 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - House Floor: HB 615 PN 610, 2019 A1232, TOBASH (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - House Game And Fisheries: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - House - House Floor: HB 615 PN 1784, FP (Y: 196 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - House Floor: HB 615 PN 610, 2019 A1232, TOBASH (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - House Game And Fisheries: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-02 | Senate | Act No. 52 |
2019-07-02 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Signed in House |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-06-10 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Referred to FINANCE |
2019-05-13 | Senate | In the Senate |
2019-05-13 | House | Third consideration and final passage (196-3) |
2019-05-13 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-05-08 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-05-08 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2019-05-07 | House | Removed from table |
2019-05-01 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-05-01 | House | First consideration |
2019-05-01 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-02-28 | House | Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES |