PA HB610 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-09-20 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-09-20 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of May 19, 1995 (P.L.33, No.3), known as the Economic Development Agency, Fiduciary and Lender Environmental Liability Protection Act, further providing for definitions.
Title
Further providing for definitions.
Sponsors
Rep. Austin Davis [D] | Rep. Mark Longietti [D] | Rep. Barbara Gleim [R] | Rep. Summer Lee [D] |
Rep. Nick Pisciottano [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-25 - House - House Urban Affairs: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-20 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-09-20 | House | Removed from table |
2021-05-25 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-05-25 | House | First consideration |
2021-05-25 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-03-01 | House | Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS |