PA HB604 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 25-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2022 - 50% progression
Action: 2022-04-12 - Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY
Pending: Senate Environmental Resources & Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.177, No.175), known as The Administrative Code of 1929, providing for environmental permits and plan approvals; making related repeals; and abrogating regulations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for environmental permits and plan approvals; making related repeals; and abrogating regulations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-04-11 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-11 - House - House Floor: HB 604 PN 2906, FP (Y: 115 N: 85 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - House - House Floor: HB 604 PN 1907, 2021 A3819 (Y: 122 N: 76 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - House - House Floor: HB 604 PN 1907, 2021 A3819, MOT POSTPONE (Y: 87 N: 111 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-06-23 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: Adopt Amendment A01953 (Y: 17 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-04-12SenateReferred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY
2022-04-11SenateIn the Senate
2022-04-11HouseThird consideration and final passage (115-85)
2022-04-11HouseRe-reported as committed
2022-03-30HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2022-03-30HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2022-03-29HouseRemoved from table
2021-11-10HouseLaid on the table
2021-11-10HouseRemoved from table
2021-09-15HouseLaid on the table
2021-09-15HouseRe-reported as committed
2021-06-23HouseRe-committed to RULES
2021-06-23HouseFirst consideration
2021-06-23HouseReported as amended
2021-04-08HouseReferred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2021&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=604
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0604&pn=1195
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0604&pn=1907
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0604&pn=2906
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/FN/2021/0/HB0604P2906.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=8&theDate=06/23/2021&RollCallId=765
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=8&theDate=06/23/2021&RollCallId=766
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=779
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=780
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=795
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=04/11/2022&RollCallId=1392

Bill Comments

feedback