PA HB602 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 32-14)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-05 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-05 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, providing for the Career and Technical Education Investment Incentive Program.
Title
Providing for the Career and Technical Education Investment Incentive Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-05 - House - House Floor: HB 602 PN 930, 2021 A836, OWLETT (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 18 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - House - House Education: Adopt Amendment A00723 (Y: 10 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-19 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 18 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - House - House Education: Adopt Amendment A00723 (Y: 10 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-05 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-05-05 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2021-05-04 | House | Removed from table |
2021-04-19 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-04-19 | House | First consideration |
2021-04-19 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-03-16 | House | Referred to EDUCATION |