PA HB602 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-3)
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-15 - Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES
Pending: Senate Game & Fisheries Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-15 - Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES
Pending: Senate Game & Fisheries Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 34 (Game) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in hunting and furtaking, further providing for the offense of dogs pursuing, injuring or killing big game.
Title
In hunting and furtaking, further providing for the offense of dogs pursuing, injuring or killing big game.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-10 - House - House Floor: HB 602 PN 630, FP (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - House Game And Fisheries: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - House Game And Fisheries: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-15 | Senate | Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES |
2017-05-10 | Senate | In the Senate |
2017-05-10 | House | Third consideration and final passage (196-0) |
2017-05-10 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-05-09 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-05-09 | House | Second consideration |
2017-05-08 | House | Removed from table |
2017-04-26 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-04-26 | House | First consideration |
2017-04-26 | House | Reported as committed |
2017-02-23 | House | Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES |