PA HB60 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - Referred to FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 71 (State Government) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in preliminary provisions relating to retirement for State employees and officers, further providing for definitions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In preliminary provisions relating to retirement for State employees and officers, further providing for definitions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-21 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House Floor: HB 60 PN 565, FP (Y: 108 N: 81 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Floor: HB 60 PN 64, 2019 A69, DELISSIO (Y: 74 N: 100 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [FAIL]
2019-02-20 - House - House Floor: HB 60 PN 64, 2019 A67, DELISSIO (Y: 73 N: 101 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [FAIL]
2019-02-20 - House - House Floor: HB 60 PN 64, 2019 A83, BOYLE (Y: 75 N: 99 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [FAIL]
2019-02-20 - House - House Floor: HB 60 PN 64, 2019 A53, BOYLE (Y: 76 N: 98 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [FAIL]
2019-02-20 - House - House Floor: HB 60 PN 64, 2019 A75, BRADFORD (Y: 74 N: 100 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [FAIL]
2019-02-20 - House - House Floor: HB 60 PN 64, 2019 A64, CUTLER (Y: 173 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A00053 (Y: 10 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-26SenateReferred to FINANCE
2019-02-21SenateIn the Senate
2019-02-21HouseThird consideration and final passage (108-81)
2019-02-21HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-02-20HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-02-20HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2019-02-19HouseRemoved from table
2019-02-19HouseLaid on the table
2019-02-19HouseFirst consideration
2019-02-19HouseReported as committed
2019-01-28HouseReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=60
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0060&pn=0064
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0060&pn=0565
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=36&theDate=02/06/2019&RollCallId=24
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=36&theDate=02/06/2019&RollCallId=25
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=42
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=43
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=44
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=45
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=46
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=47
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=54
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=02/21/2019&RollCallId=42

Bill Comments

feedback