PA HB60 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-26 - Referred to FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-26 - Referred to FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 71 (State Government) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in preliminary provisions relating to retirement for State employees and officers, further providing for definitions.
Title
In preliminary provisions relating to retirement for State employees and officers, further providing for definitions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-21 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House Floor: HB 60 PN 565, FP (Y: 108 N: 81 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Floor: HB 60 PN 64, 2019 A69, DELISSIO (Y: 74 N: 100 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [FAIL]
2019-02-20 - House - House Floor: HB 60 PN 64, 2019 A67, DELISSIO (Y: 73 N: 101 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [FAIL]
2019-02-20 - House - House Floor: HB 60 PN 64, 2019 A83, BOYLE (Y: 75 N: 99 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [FAIL]
2019-02-20 - House - House Floor: HB 60 PN 64, 2019 A53, BOYLE (Y: 76 N: 98 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [FAIL]
2019-02-20 - House - House Floor: HB 60 PN 64, 2019 A75, BRADFORD (Y: 74 N: 100 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [FAIL]
2019-02-20 - House - House Floor: HB 60 PN 64, 2019 A64, CUTLER (Y: 173 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A00053 (Y: 10 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-21 - House - House Floor: HB 60 PN 565, FP (Y: 108 N: 81 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Floor: HB 60 PN 64, 2019 A69, DELISSIO (Y: 74 N: 100 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [FAIL]
2019-02-20 - House - House Floor: HB 60 PN 64, 2019 A67, DELISSIO (Y: 73 N: 101 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [FAIL]
2019-02-20 - House - House Floor: HB 60 PN 64, 2019 A83, BOYLE (Y: 75 N: 99 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [FAIL]
2019-02-20 - House - House Floor: HB 60 PN 64, 2019 A53, BOYLE (Y: 76 N: 98 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [FAIL]
2019-02-20 - House - House Floor: HB 60 PN 64, 2019 A75, BRADFORD (Y: 74 N: 100 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [FAIL]
2019-02-20 - House - House Floor: HB 60 PN 64, 2019 A64, CUTLER (Y: 173 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A00053 (Y: 10 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-26 | Senate | Referred to FINANCE |
2019-02-21 | Senate | In the Senate |
2019-02-21 | House | Third consideration and final passage (108-81) |
2019-02-21 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-02-20 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-02-20 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2019-02-19 | House | Removed from table |
2019-02-19 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-02-19 | House | First consideration |
2019-02-19 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |