PA HB595 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-4)
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Act No. 17
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 68 (Real and Personal Property) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, as follows: in general provisions, further providing for definitions; in management of the condominium, providing for alternative dispute resolution in condominiums and for complaints filed with Bureau of Consumer Protection; in protection of purchasers, further providing for effect of violations on rights of action; in general provisions, further providing for definitions; in management of cooperatives, providing for alternative dispute resolution in cooperatives and for complaints filed with Bureau of Consumer Protection; in general provisions, further providing for definitions; in management of planned community, providing for alternative dispute resolution in planned communities and for complaints filed with Bureau of Consumer Protection; and, in protection of purchasers, further providing for effect of violations on rights of action.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As follows: in general provisions, further providing for definitions; in management of the condominium, providing for alternative dispute resolution in condominiums and for complaints filed with Bureau of Consumer Protection; in protection of purchasers, further providing for effect of violations on rights of action; in general provisions, further providing for definitions; in management of cooperatives, providing for alternative dispute resolution in cooperatives and for complaints filed with Bureau of Consumer Protection; in general provisions, further providing for definitions; in management of planned community, providing for alternative dispute resolution in planned communities and for complaints filed with Bureau of Consumer Protection; and, in protection of purchasers, further providing for effect of violations on rights of action.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 595 PN 627, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Senate Urban Affairs And Housing: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - House - House Floor: HB 595 PN 627, FP (Y: 186 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House Urban Affairs: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-04SenateAct No. 17
2018-05-04SenateApproved by the Governor
2018-04-24SenatePresented to the Governor
2018-04-23SenateSigned in Senate
2018-04-18SenateSigned in House
2018-04-17SenateThird consideration and final passage (50-0)
2018-03-19SenateRe-reported as committed
2018-02-06SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-02-06SenateSecond consideration
2018-01-24SenateRemoved from table
2017-06-27SenateLaid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
2017-05-24SenateFirst consideration
2017-05-24SenateReported as committed
2017-04-20SenateReferred to URBAN AFFAIRS AND HOUSING
2017-04-19SenateIn the Senate
2017-04-19HouseThird consideration and final passage (186-0)
2017-04-19HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-04-18HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-04-18HouseSecond consideration
2017-03-22HouseRemoved from table
2017-03-21HouseLaid on the table
2017-03-21HouseFirst consideration
2017-03-21HouseReported as committed
2017-02-23HouseReferred to URBAN AFFAIRS

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=595
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0595&pn=0627
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=40&theDate=03/21/2017&RollCallId=117
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=186
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=04/19/2017&RollCallId=264
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=35&theDate=05/24/2017&RollCallId=206
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=03/19/2018&RollCallId=689
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=450

Bill Comments

feedback