PA HB594 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-8)
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-06-11 - Referred to PUBLIC HEALTH AND WELFARE
Pending: Senate Public Health & Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-06-11 - Referred to PUBLIC HEALTH AND WELFARE
Pending: Senate Public Health & Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act providing for a program for the disposal of home-generated medical sharps, and for powers and duties of the Department of Environmental Protection.
Title
Providing for a program for the disposal of home-generated medical sharps, and for powers and duties of the Department of Environmental Protection.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-06-10 - House - HB 594 PN 651, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 192 N: 2 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-11 | Referred to PUBLIC HEALTH AND WELFARE | |
2009-06-10 | In the Senate | |
2009-06-10 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2009-06-09 | Second consideration | |
2009-06-09 | Re-reported as committed | |
2009-05-06 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2009-05-06 | Removed from table | |
2009-05-05 | Laid on the table | |
2009-05-05 | First consideration | |
2009-05-05 | Reported as committed | |
2009-02-24 | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |