PA HB592 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-22 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act designating a bridge on that portion of Pennsylvania Route 305 over Shaver's Creek in Barree Township, Huntingdon County, as the Private Harold E. "Jim" Knode Memorial Bridge.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designating a bridge on that portion of Pennsylvania Route 305 over Shaver's Creek in Barree Township, Huntingdon County, as the Private Harold E. "Jim" Knode Memorial Bridge.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-17 - House - House Floor: HB 592 PN 1375, FP (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A00308 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-22SenateReferred to TRANSPORTATION
2019-04-17SenateIn the Senate
2019-04-17HouseThird consideration and final passage (191-0)
2019-04-17HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-04-16HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-04-16HouseSecond consideration
2019-04-15HouseRemoved from table
2019-04-10HouseLaid on the table
2019-04-10HouseFirst consideration
2019-04-10HouseReported as amended
2019-03-01HouseReferred to TRANSPORTATION

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=592
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0592&pn=0638
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0592&pn=1375
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=04/17/2019&RollCallId=331
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=205
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=38&theDate=04/10/2019&RollCallId=350
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=38&theDate=04/10/2019&RollCallId=349

Bill Comments

feedback