PA HB585 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-16)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-23 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-23 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 20 (Decedents, Estates and Fiduciaries) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in anatomical gifts, further providing for manner of executing anatomical gifts.
Title
In anatomical gifts, further providing for manner of executing anatomical gifts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-20 - House - House Floor: HB 585 PN 3369, FP (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-05-25 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-17 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-17 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A06982 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-25 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-17 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-17 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A06982 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-23 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2016-06-20 | Senate | In the Senate |
2016-06-20 | House | Third consideration and final passage (194-0) |
2016-05-25 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2016-05-24 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-05-24 | House | Second consideration |
2016-05-18 | House | Removed from table |
2016-05-17 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-05-17 | House | First consideration |
2016-05-17 | House | Reported as amended |
2015-02-23 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |