PA HB582 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-09-25 - First consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 34 (Game) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in hunting and furtaking licenses, providing for a volunteer instructor license.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In hunting and furtaking licenses, providing for a volunteer instructor license.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-09-25 - Senate - Senate Game And Fisheries: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House Floor: HB 582 PN 618, FP (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House Game And Fisheries: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-25SenateFirst consideration
2018-09-25SenateReported as committed
2017-04-06SenateReferred to GAME AND FISHERIES
2017-04-05SenateIn the Senate
2017-04-05HouseThird consideration and final passage (191-0)
2017-04-05HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-04-04HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-04-04HouseSecond consideration
2017-04-03HouseRemoved from table
2017-03-21HouseLaid on the table
2017-03-21HouseFirst consideration
2017-03-21HouseReported as committed
2017-02-23HouseReferred to GAME AND FISHERIES

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=582
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0582&pn=0618
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=18&theDate=03/21/2017&RollCallId=121
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=156
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=04/05/2017&RollCallId=219
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=11&theDate=09/25/2018&RollCallId=1097

Bill Comments

feedback