PA HB573 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-22 - Act No. 154
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-22 - Act No. 154
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in preliminary provisions, further providing for definitions; in financial responsibility, providing for neighborhood electric vehicles; in special vehicles and pedestrians, providing for operation of pedalcycles with electric assist; and, in inspection of vehicles, further providing for operation of vehicle without official certificate of inspection.
Title
In preliminary provisions, further providing for definitions; in financial responsibility, providing for neighborhood electric vehicles; in special vehicles and pedestrians, providing for operation of pedalcycles with electric assist; and, in inspection of vehicles, further providing for operation of vehicle without official certificate of inspection.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-09-23 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-22 | House | Act No. 154 |
2014-10-22 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2014-10-16 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2014-10-15 | House | Signed in Senate |
2014-10-15 | House | Signed in House |
2014-10-15 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (189-7) |
2014-10-15 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2014-10-08 | House | Referred to RULES |
2014-10-08 | House | In the House |
2014-10-08 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2014-10-07 | Senate | Second consideration |
2014-09-23 | Senate | First consideration |
2014-09-23 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2014-06-20 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2014-06-09 | Senate | In the Senate |
2014-06-09 | House | Third consideration and final passage (195-0) |
2014-06-09 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2014-06-04 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-06-04 | House | Second consideration |
2014-06-03 | House | Removed from table |
2014-04-29 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-04-29 | House | First consideration |
2014-04-29 | House | Reported as amended |
2013-02-08 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |