PA HB57 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act designating a bridge on that portion of State Route 4001 over Crooked Creek, Armstrong Township, Indiana County, as the Sergeant Carl Roof Memorial Bridge.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designating a bridge on that portion of State Route 4001 over Crooked Creek, Armstrong Township, Indiana County, as the Sergeant Carl Roof Memorial Bridge.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-17 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - House Floor: HB 57 PN 40, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-18SenateReferred to TRANSPORTATION
2021-03-17SenateIn the Senate
2021-03-17HouseThird consideration and final passage (201-0)
2021-03-17HouseRe-reported as committed
2021-03-16HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-03-16HouseSecond consideration
2021-02-05HouseRemoved from table
2021-02-04HouseLaid on the table
2021-02-04HouseFirst consideration
2021-02-04HouseReported as committed
2021-01-11HouseReferred to TRANSPORTATION

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback