PA HB564 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in high schools, providing for assessment of civic knowledge.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In high schools, providing for assessment of civic knowledge.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-22 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - House - House Floor: HB 564 PN 3298, FP (Y: 191 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - House - House Education: Adopt Amendment A06073 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-23SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-05-23SenateSecond consideration
2018-05-22SenateFirst consideration
2018-05-22SenateReported as amended
2018-04-30SenateReferred to EDUCATION
2018-04-16SenateIn the Senate
2018-04-16HouseThird consideration and final passage (191-4)
2018-04-16HouseRe-reported as committed
2018-04-11HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-04-11HouseSecond consideration
2018-04-10HouseRemoved from table
2018-04-09HouseLaid on the table
2018-04-09HouseFirst consideration
2018-04-09HouseReported as amended
2017-02-21HouseReferred to EDUCATION

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=564
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0564&pn=0589
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0564&pn=3298
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0564&pn=3547
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=12&theDate=04/09/2018&RollCallId=1353
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=12&theDate=04/09/2018&RollCallId=1354
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1111
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=04/16/2018&RollCallId=1435
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=23&theDate=05/22/2018&RollCallId=855

Bill Comments

feedback