PA HB564 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-19 - Act No. 35
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-19 - Act No. 35
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in high schools, providing for assessment of civic knowledge.
Title
In high schools, providing for assessment of civic knowledge.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-06 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - House - House Floor: HB 564 PN 3547, CONCUR (Y: 167 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 564 PN 3547, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-04 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - House - House Floor: HB 564 PN 3298, FP (Y: 191 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - House - House Education: Adopt Amendment A06073 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - House - House Floor: HB 564 PN 3547, CONCUR (Y: 167 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 564 PN 3547, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-04 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - House - House Floor: HB 564 PN 3298, FP (Y: 191 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - House - House Education: Adopt Amendment A06073 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-19 | House | Act No. 35 |
2018-06-19 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2018-06-11 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2018-06-11 | House | Signed in Senate |
2018-06-06 | House | Signed in House |
2018-06-06 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (167-27) |
2018-06-06 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2018-06-06 | House | Referred to RULES |
2018-06-05 | House | In the House |
2018-06-05 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2018-06-04 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Second consideration |
2018-05-22 | Senate | First consideration |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Referred to EDUCATION |
2018-04-16 | Senate | In the Senate |
2018-04-16 | House | Third consideration and final passage (191-4) |
2018-04-16 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2018-04-11 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-04-11 | House | Second consideration |
2018-04-10 | House | Removed from table |
2018-04-09 | House | Laid on the table |
2018-04-09 | House | First consideration |
2018-04-09 | House | Reported as amended |
2017-02-21 | House | Referred to EDUCATION |