PA HB563 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 59-24)
Status: Passed on November 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-11-22 - Act No. 103
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 59-24)
Status: Passed on November 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-11-22 - Act No. 103
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, further providing for motorcycle safety education program.
Title
Further providing for motorcycle safety education program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-11-01 - Senate - HB 563 PN 619, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-10-18 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-11 - House - HB 563 PN 619, FP (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2011-10-18 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-11 - House - HB 563 PN 619, FP (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-11-22 | Senate | Act No. 103 |
2011-11-22 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2011-11-15 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2011-11-14 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2011-11-01 | Senate | Signed in House |
2011-11-01 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2011-10-25 | Senate | Second consideration |
2011-10-18 | Senate | First consideration |
2011-10-18 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2011-05-16 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2011-05-11 | Senate | In the Senate |
2011-05-11 | House | Third consideration and final passage (191-0) |
2011-05-11 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2011-05-10 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2011-05-10 | House | Second consideration |
2011-05-09 | House | Removed from table |
2011-04-27 | House | Laid on the table |
2011-04-27 | House | Removed from table |
2011-02-16 | House | Laid on the table |
2011-02-16 | House | First consideration |
2011-02-16 | House | Reported as committed |
2011-02-14 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |