PA HB562 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-5)
Status: Engrossed on October 17 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-10-31 - Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of November 22, 2005 (P.L.407, No.74), known as the Pennsylvania Breast and Cervical Cancer Early Screening Act, further providing for Pennsylvania Breast and Cervical Cancer Early Screening Program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Further providing for Pennsylvania Breast and Cervical Cancer Early Screening Program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-10-17 - House - House Floor: HB 562 PN 587, FP (Y: 188 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-10-17 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-22 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-31SenateReferred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
2018-10-17SenateIn the Senate
2018-10-17HouseThird consideration and final passage (188-0)
2018-10-17HouseRe-reported as committed
2018-10-16HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-10-16HouseSecond consideration
2018-10-15HouseRemoved from table
2018-09-12HouseLaid on the table
2018-09-12HouseRe-reported as committed
2018-06-22HouseRe-committed to RULES
2018-06-22HouseFirst consideration
2018-06-22HouseReported as committed
2017-02-21HouseReferred to HEALTH

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback