PA HB56 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-5)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Act No. 17
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act designating a bridge, identified as Bridge Key 8516, carrying State Route 271 over the West Branch Susquehanna River, Northern Cambria Borough, Cambria County, as the Sergeant William Stock Memorial Bridge.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designating a bridge, identified as Bridge Key 8516, carrying State Route 271 over the West Branch Susquehanna River, Northern Cambria Borough, Cambria County, as the Sergeant William Stock Memorial Bridge.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 56 PN 39, Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - House Floor: HB 56 PN 39, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-01SenateAct No. 17
2021-06-01SenateApproved by the Governor
2021-05-26SenatePresented to the Governor
2021-05-25SenateSigned in Senate
2021-05-24SenateSigned in House
2021-05-10SenateThird consideration and final passage (47-0)
2021-04-21SenateSecond consideration
2021-04-20SenateFirst consideration
2021-04-20SenateReported as committed
2021-03-18SenateReferred to TRANSPORTATION
2021-03-17SenateIn the Senate
2021-03-17HouseThird consideration and final passage (201-0)
2021-03-17HouseRe-reported as committed
2021-03-16HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-03-16HouseSecond consideration
2021-02-05HouseRemoved from table
2021-02-04HouseLaid on the table
2021-02-04HouseFirst consideration
2021-02-04HouseReported as committed
2021-01-11HouseReferred to TRANSPORTATION

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2021&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=56
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0056&pn=0039
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/FN/2021/0/HB0056P0039.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=38&theDate=02/04/2021&RollCallId=73
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=70
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=03/17/2021&RollCallId=173
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=19&theDate=04/20/2021&RollCallId=119
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=95

Bill Comments

feedback